EP0432339 - A sheet metal door frame and a method for installing the same in a doorway [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWEDOOR AB Box 550 S-265 01 Astorp / SE | For all designated states Lindab Profil AB 269 82 Bastad / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states SWEDOOR AB Box 550 S-265 01 Astorp / SE | ||
For all designated states Lindab Profil AB S-269 82 Bastad / SE | |||
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states SWEDOOR AB Box 550 S-265 01 Astorp / SE | ||
For all designated states LINDAB PLATISOL AB S-269 00 Bastad / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubois, Stefan Tagagatan 7 S-252 22 Helsingborg / SE | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Mossmark, Anders Lennart, et al Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Mossmark, Anders, et al Albihn West AB, Box 142 S-401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 89850435.2 | 15.12.1989 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0432339 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0432339 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/988 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
E06B3/988 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1991/35] |
Former [1991/25] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Türzarge aus Metallblech und sein Installierungsverfahren | [1991/25] | English: | A sheet metal door frame and a method for installing the same in a doorway | [1991/25] | French: | Huisserie de porte en tôle métallique et procédé pour son installation | [1991/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, ES, FR | 14.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/07] | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.01.1991 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.1991 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.1991 | FR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1574493 (LEONARD ELOF R); | [A]US2843232 (GOLDBERG HARRY H); | [A]US2850126 (FURNEY EDWARD R); | [A]US2869695 (HERR THEODORE Z, et al); | [A]US3141533 (BELOW ROBERT F, et al); | [A]US3429076 (FORTSCH FRANCIS J, et al); | [A]WO8806670 (GEJLAND KJELL [SE], et al) |