EP0354202 - 2,6-Substituted 1,2- or 1,6-dihydropyridine compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chupp, John Paul 29 Lemp Road Kirkwood Missouri 63122 / US | 02 /
Lee, Len Fang 2496 Annapolis Way St. Charles Missouri 63303 / US | 03 /
Goure, William Frederick 2528 Wesmeade Drive Maryland Heights Missouri 63043 / US | 04 /
Molyneaux, John Major 12420 Highlife Drive St. Louis Missouri 63146 / US | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Bosch, Henry, et al Monsanto Europe S.A./N.V. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 1150 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | Bosch, Henry, et al Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 21 B-1150 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [1991/27] | McLean, Peter MONSANTO SERVICES INTERNATIONAL SA/NV Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No. 21 B-1150 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [1990/06] | Lunt, John Cooper Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 L.Box 21 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 89870118.0 | 28.07.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | US19880227030 | 01.08.1988 Original published format: US 227030 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354202 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354202 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0354202 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/90, C07D401/06, A01N43/40, A01N43/48 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/04 (KR);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/06] | C07D401/06, A01N43/40, A01N43/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/06] | Title | German: | 2,6-Substituierte 1,2- oder 1,6-Dihydropyridin-Derivate | [1990/06] | English: | 2,6-Substituted 1,2- or 1,6-dihydropyridine compounds | [1990/06] | French: | Dérivés de 1,2- ou 1,6-dihydropyridine 2,6-substitués | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 14.09.1994 | SE | 14.12.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1995/29] | SE | 14.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0135491 (MONSANTO CO [US]) |