EP0363346 - Liquid laundry detergent with curable amine functional silicone for fabric wrinkle reduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coffindaffer, Timothy Woodrow 118 Bridle Lane Loveland Ohio 45140 / US | 02 /
Trinh, Toan 8671 Creekwood Lane Maineville Ohio 45039 / US | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 89870148.7 | 05.10.1989 | [1990/15] | Priority number, date | US19880254983 | 07.10.1988 Original published format: US 254983 | [1990/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0363346 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0363346 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D3/16, D06M15/643 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
C11D3/3742 (EP,US);
C11D3/08 (KR);
D06M15/6436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | Flüssiges Waschmittel mit härtbarer Siliciumverbindung mit Amin als funktioneller Gruppe zur Verminderung des Knitterns | [1990/15] | English: | Liquid laundry detergent with curable amine functional silicone for fabric wrinkle reduction | [1990/15] | French: | Composition détergente liquide pour le linge contenant le composé de silicone avec un amine comme groupe fonctionnel durcissable pour la réduction de la froissabilité | [1990/15] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 11.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/11] | 19.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8703682 (HOFFMANN STAERKEFABRIKEN AG [DE]); | [Y]US4541936 (ONA ISAO [JP], et al); | [XPD]US4800026 (COFFINDAFFER TIMOTHY W [US], et al); | [AD]US4419391 (TANAKA MASAKI [JP], et al); | [AD]EP0058493 |