EP0340208 - Process for producing a brake lining [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ING. JOHANN LEINWEBER Anstalt für Mechanik Industriegelände Nord Johann-Giefing-Strasse 8-10 A-2700 Wiener Neustadt / AT | For all designated states CHEMISCHE WERKE FRANZ V. FURTENBACH GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. Franz v. Furtenbach-Strasse 1 A-2700 Wr. Neustadt / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states ING. JOHANN LEINWEBER Anstalt für Mechanik Industriegelände Nord Johann-Giefing-Strasse 8-10 A-2700 Wiener Neustadt / AT | ||
For all designated states CHEMISCHE WERKE FRANZ V. FURTENBACH GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. Franz v. Furtenbach-Strasse 1 A-2700 Wr. Neustadt / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farnleitner, Armin Pognergasse 12 A-2700 Wr. Neustadt / AT | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | Müllner, Erwin, et al Patentanwälte Müllner, Katschinka, Müllner Weihburggasse 9 Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | Müllner, Erwin, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Postfach 159 Weihburggasse 9 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 89890115.2 | 20.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | AT19880001014 | 20.04.1988 Original published format: AT 101488 | [1989/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0340208 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/14, F16D69/04 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
F16D69/0408 (EP);
F16D2069/0441 (EP);
F16D2069/0475 (EP);
F16D2069/0491 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Bremsbelages | [1989/44] | English: | Process for producing a brake lining | [1989/44] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une garniture de frein | [1989/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 05.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/19] | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2025826 ; | [A]AT314919B ; | DE3617846 [ ]; | [A]GB1426122 |