EP0375653 - Process for the treatment of waste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PERLMOOSER ZEMENTWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Operngasse 11 A-1043 Wien / AT | [1990/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Fritz, Dr. Innstrasse 15 A-1200 Wien / AT | 02 /
Concin, Roland, Dr. Postfach 25 A-6322 Kirchbichl/Tirol / AT | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Pfeifer, Otto, et al Patentanwälte Schütz und Partner Fleischmanngasse 9 A-1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Pfeifer, Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schütz und Partner Fleischmanngasse 9 A-1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 89890332.3 | 27.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | AT19880003158 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: AT 315888 | AT19890001716 | 14.07.1989 Original published format: AT 171689 | [1990/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0375653 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0375653 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C04B18/04, C04B18/02, A62D3/00 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B18/04 (EP);
C04B2111/00784 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Abfallstoffen | [1990/26] | English: | Process for the treatment of waste | [1990/26] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement de déchets | [1990/26] | File destroyed: | 22.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/22] | 07.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.10.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0120097 ; | [A]EP0017741 ; | [A]US3720609 ; | [A]FR2542223 ; | [A]US4354942 ; | [A]WO8200998 ; | [A]GB2060600 ; | [AD]FR2471265 ; | [A]DE2318222 ; | [A]US4113504 ; | [A]JPS5670821 | [A] - PATENT OFFICE OF JAPAN File supplier JAPS & JP-A-56070821 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND)13-06-1981 |