Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0387285
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
22.12.1994 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] |
14.10.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] |
27.09.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] |
16.09.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] |
22.03.1994 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] |
30.12.1993 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] |
29.04.1992 |
First examination report |
|
04.08.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] |
04.08.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] |