EP0343218 - MECHANICALLY CONNECTED MULTIPART OBJECTS WITH ELEMENTS FOR IMPROVING THE HEAT FLOW BETWEEN THE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLWERK PLANSEE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. 6600 Reutte, Tirol / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states METALLWERK PLANSEE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. A-6600 Reutte, Tirol / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAFFLER, Reinhard Schulweg 8 A-6600 Ehenbichl / AT | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Lohnert, Wolfgang Lähn 12 6600 Breitenwang / Reutte / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | Lohnert, Wolfgang, Dr. Plansee Aktiengesellschaft A-6600 Reutte / AT | Application number, filing date | 89900052.5 | 02.12.1988 | [1989/48] | WO1988EP01096 | Priority number, date | AT19870003209 | 04.12.1987 Original published format: AT 320987 | [1989/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8905430 | Date: | 15.06.1989 | [1989/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0343218 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0343218 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/00, F28F13/00, G21B1/00 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
G21B1/13 (EP);
F28F2013/006 (EP);
Y02E30/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/48] | F27D1/00, F28F13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/48] | Title | German: | MECHANISCH VERBUNDENER, MEHRTEILIGER KÖRPER MIT ELEMENTEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES WÄRMEFLUSSES ZWISCHEN DEN TEILEN | [1989/48] | English: | MECHANICALLY CONNECTED MULTIPART OBJECTS WITH ELEMENTS FOR IMPROVING THE HEAT FLOW BETWEEN THE PARTS | [1989/48] | French: | CORPS A PLUSIEURS PARTIES MECANIQUEMENT RELIEES POURVU D'ELEMENTS QUI AMELIORENT LE FLUX DE CHALEUR ENTRE LES PARTIES | [1989/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.1989 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 08.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE3601707 [ ] (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V [DE]); | GB821690 [ ] (ARMOUR RES FOUND); | FR1371739 [ ] (JURID WERKE GMBH); | US3161478 [ ] (HYMAN CHESSIN); | DE2552686 [ ] (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK) |