EP0393105 - SIZING AGENT FOR PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASSELLA Aktiengesellschaft Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | [1990/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOETZE, Thomas Hasenpfad 20 D-6232 Bad Soden/Ts.-Neuenhain / DE | 02 /
KAMUTZKI, Walter Am Bahnhof 15 D-6110 Dieburg / DE | 03 /
SCHÖN, Manfred Humboldtstr. 17 D-6054 Rodgau 5 / DE | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Urbach, Hans-Georg CASSELLA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Patentabteilung, Hanauer Landstrasse 526 60386 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Urbach, Hans-Georg, Dr. CASSELLA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Patentabteilung, Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 89900215.8 | 29.11.1988 | [1990/43] | WO1988EP01080 | Priority number, date | DE19873741282 | 05.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3741282 | [1990/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8905376 | Date: | 15.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0393105 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D21H3/56, D21H3/02 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
D21H17/29 (EP);
D21H17/51 (EP);
D21H21/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | LEIMUNGSMITTEL FÜR PAPIER | [1990/43] | English: | SIZING AGENT FOR PAPER | [1990/43] | French: | AGENT DE COLLAGE POUR DU PAPIER | [1990/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 30.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/09] | 11.10.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE921300 [ ]; | DE2540616 [ ] | [A] - J.P. Casey: "Pulp and Paper Chemistry and Chemical Technology", 3. Auflage, Band III, Kapitel 14 B.T. Hofreiter: "Natural products for wet-end addition", 1981, John Wiley & Sons, Inc. (New York, US) Seiten 1475-1514 |