EP0389550 - SULFONATED 2-(2'-HYDROXYARYL)-2H-BENZOTRIAZOLES AND/OR SULFONATED AROMATIC FORMALDEHYDE CONDENSATES AND THEIR USE TO IMPROVE STAIN RESISTANCE AND DYE LIGHTFASTNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERENBAUM, Morris, Benjamin 59 Crest Drive Summit, NJ 07901 / US | 02 /
BONFIELD, John, Henry 183 Lyons Drive Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 03 /
COLE, Charles, Jayroe 11560 Teterling Road Chester, VA 23831 / US | 04 /
HARRIS, Paul, Wesley 2321 Hey Road Richmond, VA 23224 / US | 05 /
IZOD, Thomas, Paul 112 Victoria Drive Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 06 /
ULMER, Harry, Edwards Route 2, Box 3 Cameron, SC 29030 / US | 07 /
HOPF, Frederick, Robert 350 Parsippany Road Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 08 /
YARDLEY, James, Thomas 40 Macculloch Avenue Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 09 /
BLAND, Karen, Marie 144 Heritage Lane Hamburg, NJ 07419 / US | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 89900404.8 | 12.10.1988 | [1990/40] | WO1988US03547 | Priority number, date | US19870111873 | 21.10.1987 Original published format: US 111873 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8903826 | Date: | 05.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0389550 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389550 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/20, D06M13/00, D06P1/00 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
C07D249/20 (EP);
D06M13/256 (EP);
D06M13/352 (EP);
D06M15/412 (EP);
D06P1/56 (EP);
D06P1/6426 (EP);
D06M2101/34 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/40] | C07D249/20, D06M13/34, D06P1/62 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/40] | Title | German: | SULFONIERTE 2-(2'-HYDROXYARYL)-2-H-BENZOTRIAZOLE UND/ODER SULFONIERTE AROMATISCHE FORMALDEHYDKONDENSATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG, UM FLECKENWIDERSTANDSFÄHIGKEIT UND FARBENLICHTECHTHEIT ZU VERBESSERN | [1990/40] | English: | SULFONATED 2-(2'-HYDROXYARYL)-2H-BENZOTRIAZOLES AND/OR SULFONATED AROMATIC FORMALDEHYDE CONDENSATES AND THEIR USE TO IMPROVE STAIN RESISTANCE AND DYE LIGHTFASTNESS | [1990/40] | French: | 2-(2'-HYDROXYARYL)-2H-BENZOTRIAZOLES SULFONES ET OU CONDENSATS DE FORMALDEHYDE AROMATIQUES SULFONES ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR AMELIORER LA RESISTANCE AUX TACHES ET LA STABILITE A LA LUMIERE DES COULEURS | [1990/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.1990 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.1994 | BE | 20.07.1994 | SE | 20.10.1994 | [1995/29] |
Former [1995/15] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | BE | 20.07.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4226763 (DEXTER MARTIN, et al); | [A]US4278589 (DEXTER MARTIN, et al); | [A]US4668235 (EVANS NEIL A [AU], et al); | [AP]WO8800942 (ALLIED CORP [US]) |