EP0357779 - SUPERCONDUCTIVE WIRE AND CABLE HAVING HIGH CURRENT DENSITY, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGINO, Sadaaki 7-203, 33-8, Harayama 2-chome Urawa-shi Saitama 336 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Motokazu 1135-4, Shima-cho Omiya-shi Saitama 330 / JP | 03 /
KONDO, Hideyuki 279, Niitsutsumi Ohaza, Omiya-shi Saitama 330 / JP | 04 /
NISHIKAWA, Shigeru Mitsubishi Kinzoku K. K. Taiseiryo 1-545, Onari-cho Omiya-shi Saitama 330 / JP | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | Andrae, Steffen Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | Andrae, Steffen, Dr. Patentanwälte Andrae, Flach, Haug, Kneissl Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89900917.9 | 26.12.1988 | [1990/11] | WO1988JP01334 | Priority number, date | JP19870328673 | 25.12.1987 Original published format: JP 32867387 | JP19870328674 | 25.12.1987 Original published format: JP 32867487 | [1990/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8906432 | Date: | 13.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0357779 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.07.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01B12/04, H01B13/00 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
H10N60/203 (EP,KR);
H10N60/0801 (EP,KR);
Y10S505/74 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/11] | Title | German: | SUPRALEITENDE KABEL UND DRÄHTE MIT HOHER STROMDICHTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [1990/11] | English: | SUPERCONDUCTIVE WIRE AND CABLE HAVING HIGH CURRENT DENSITY, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THEM | [1990/11] | French: | FIL SUPRACONDUCTEUR ET CABLE PRESENTANT UNE FORTE DENSITE DE COURANT, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1990/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1989 | Translation filed | 30.08.1989 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.1989 | Search fee paid | 30.08.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 20.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0281474 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [XP]EP0282286 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | International search | JPS63279512 [ ] (TOSHIBA CORP); | JPS63282152 [ ] (TOSHIBA CORP); | JPS64617 [ ] (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) |