EP0350503 - FUEL INJECTORS FOR TURBINE ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNDSTRAND CORPORATION 4949 Harrison Avenue P.O. Box 7003 Rockford Illinois 61125- 7003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states SUNDSTRAND CORPORATION 4949 Harrison Avenue P.O. Box 7003 Rockford Illinois 61125- 7003 / US | ||
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states SUNDSTRAND CORPORATION 4949 Harrison Avenue P.O. Box 7003 Rockford, IL 61125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEKLETON, Jack, R. 2409 Hartford Street San Diego, CA 92110 / US | 02 /
ARCHIBALD, John, P. 5554 Candlelight Drive La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | SERJEANTS 25, The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89901011.0 | 09.12.1988 | [1990/03] | WO1988US04423 | Priority number, date | US19870133491 | 14.12.1987 Original published format: US 133491 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8905903 | Date: | 29.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0350503 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0350503 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.06.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/08 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
F23R3/283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/03] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG FÜR TURBINENMOTOREN | [1990/03] | English: | FUEL INJECTORS FOR TURBINE ENGINES | [1990/03] | French: | INJECTEURS DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A TURBINE | [1990/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1989 | Search fee paid | 04.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 09.12.1992 | [1994/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1092279 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD); | [A]CH262382 (VICKERS ELECTRICAL CO LTD [GB]); | [A]GB650462 (POWER JETS RES & DEV LTD) | International search | [A]US3088279 (ERNST DIEDRICH GUNTHER); | [X]US3613360 (HOWES LESLIE D); | [X]US3972182 (SALVI ENRICO); | [X]US4198815 (BOBO MELVIN [US], et al); | [A]US4478045 (SHEKLETON JACK [US]); | [X]US4549402 (SAINTSBURY JOHN A [CA], et al) |