EP0403484 - SOUND-ABSORBING WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VETTERLI, Peter Waldeggstrasse 17 CH-8810 Horgen / CH | [1990/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Scheidegger, Werner & Co. Siewerdtstrasse 95 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Scheidegger, Werner & Co. Siewerdtstrasse 95 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 89901051.6 | 11.01.1989 | [1990/52] | WO1989CH00006 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9008238 | Date: | 26.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0403484 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/82, E01F8/00 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
E01F8/0023 (EP);
E01F8/007 (EP);
E04B1/8227 (EP);
E04B2001/8263 (EP);
E04B2001/8452 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [1990/52] | Title | German: | SCHALLSCHLUCKWAND | [1990/52] | English: | SOUND-ABSORBING WALL | [1990/52] | French: | PAROI INSONORE | [1990/52] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1990 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 25.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE3714089 [ ] (VETTERLI PETER [CH]); | DE2456915 [ ] (ACROW WOLFF GMBH); | FR2612217 [ ] (ROUSSET MICHEL [FR]); | US4143495 [ ] (HINTZ ULRICH) |