EP0397715 - ARRANGEMENT FOR MACHINING AND/OR ASSEMBLING COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sticht, Walter Karl-Heinrich-Waggerl-Strasse 8 A-4800 Attnang-Puchheim / AT | [1990/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Secklehner, Günter Rechtsanwalt, Pyhrnstrasse 1 8940 Liezen / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Secklehner, Günter, Dr. Rechtsanwalt, Pyhrnstrasse 1 A-8940 Liezen / AT | ||
Former [1990/47] | Wolke, Heidemarie, Dr. Stadtplatz 7 A-4400 Steyr / AT | Application number, filing date | 89901247.0 | 05.01.1989 | [1990/47] | WO1989AT00002 | Priority number, date | AT19880000020 | 07.01.1988 Original published format: AT 2088 | [1990/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8906177 | Date: | 13.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0397715 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397715 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q7/00, B65G21/00, B65G21/20, B65G23/44, B65G37/00 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
B23Q7/035 (EP,US);
B23P21/004 (EP,US);
B65G21/06 (EP,US);
B65G37/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5196 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/47] | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR BEARBEITUNG UND/ODER MONTAGE VON BAUTEILEN | [1990/47] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR MACHINING AND/OR ASSEMBLING COMPONENTS | [1990/47] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR TRAVAILLER OU MONTER DES PIECES | [1990/47] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1990 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 03.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 18.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.04.1994 | NL | 27.04.1994 | SE | 27.04.1994 | [2002/23] |
Former [1995/12] | BE | 27.04.1994 | |
NL | 27.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | BE | 27.04.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016994 (FLEMING WILLIAM B); | [A]US2753039 (VELTEN FRANK X, et al); | [A]US2764276 (RUPPE PETER P); | [X]US3605994 (PARLETTE CARL L); | [A]DE3304091 (STICHT FERTIGUNGSTECH STIWA [AT]); | [A]DE3502820 (STICHT WALTER) |