EP0395721 - CONTROL AND DETECTION CIRCUITRY FOR MASS AIRFLOW SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Ki, W. 116 Justice Grice Williamsburg, VA 23185 / US | 02 /
COOK, Charles, R., Jr. 595-202 Chinkupin Trail Newport News, VA 23602 / US | [1990/45] | Application number, filing date | 89901387.4 | 16.12.1988 | [1990/45] | WO1988US04509 | Priority number, date | US19870137220 | 23.12.1987 Original published format: US 137220 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8905967 | Date: | 29.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0395721 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0395721 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/68 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
G01F1/698 (EP,US);
G01F1/68 (KR);
B65B43/123 (EP,US);
G01F1/6845 (EP,US);
B31B2155/001 (EP,US);
B31B2155/0014 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/45] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGS- UND DETEKTIONSSCHALTUNG FÜR MASSENLUFTDURCHFLUSSSENSOREN | [1990/45] | English: | CONTROL AND DETECTION CIRCUITRY FOR MASS AIRFLOW SENSORS | [1990/45] | French: | CIRCUITS DE COMMANDE ET DE DETECTION POUR CAPTEURS D'ECOULEMENT MASSIQUE D'AIR | [1990/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1990 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 10.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2448128 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | EP0169519 [ ] (HONEYWELL INC [US]) | [A] - SAE publication no. 655, February 1986, K.W. Lee et al.: "Silicon micromachining technology for automotive applications" pages 45-54 |