EP0372010 - METHOD FOR MAINTAINING ROTATION OF AN ENGINE CRANKSHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAHIATA, Tahuhu Rue Paul-Bernière, Lot Pater No. 88, B.P. 5.947 Pirae, Tahiti / FR | [1990/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/24] | Application number, filing date | 89901485.6 | 28.12.1988 | [1990/24] | WO1988FR00653 | Priority number, date | FR19880000705 | 22.01.1988 Original published format: FR 8800705 | [1990/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8906876 | Date: | 27.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0372010 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02K53/00 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
H02K53/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HALTEN EINER MOTORKURBELWELLE IN ROTATIONSBEWEGUNG | [1990/24] | English: | METHOD FOR MAINTAINING ROTATION OF AN ENGINE CRANKSHAFT | [1990/24] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ENTRETENIR LA ROTATION DU VILEBREQUIN D'UN MOTEUR | [1990/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.1989 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 01.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/01] | 31.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.09.1989 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   28.11.1989 | 25.09.1989 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   28.11.1989 | 25.09.1989 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   28.11.1989 | 25.09.1989 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.11.1989 | 25.09.1989 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   28.11.1989 | 25.09.1989 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.11.1989 | 25.09.1989 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   28.11.1989 | 25.09.1989 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   28.11.1989 | 25.09.1989 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.11.1989 | 25.09.1989 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.11.1989 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE2653497 [ ]; | BE865168 [ ]; | DE3442195 [ ] | [A] - Betriebstechnik, volume 22, no. 3, mars 1981, (Gr{felfing, DE), "Mit dem Perpetuum mobile gegen Atomkraftwerke"page 6 |