EP0354232 - DEVICE FOR BALANCING A DISPLACABLE LOAD, POSSIBLY VARIABLE, COMPRISING A FRICTION SYSTEM FOR IMMOBILIZING SAID LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE VENTILATION ET D'ELECTRICITE APPLIQUEES - VELECTA Rue George Sand F-41200 Romorantin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states SOCIETE DE VENTILATION ET D'ELECTRICITE APPLIQUEES - VELECTA Rue George Sand F-41200 Romorantin / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALKO, Jacques Route de Saumur La Chapelle-sur-Loire F-37140 Bourgueil / FR | [1990/07] | Representative(s) | Michardière, Bernard, et al Cabinet Armengaud Aîné 3, Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | Michardière, Bernard, et al 7ter Boulevard Henri Ruel F-94120 Fontenay-sous-Bois / FR | Application number, filing date | 89901567.1 | 18.01.1989 | [1990/07] | WO1989FR00014 | Priority number, date | FR19880000485 | 18.01.1988 Original published format: FR 8800485 | [1990/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8906768 | Date: | 27.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0354232 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/28, A45D20/32 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
F16M11/42 (EP);
A45D20/32 (EP);
F16B7/14 (EP);
F16M11/10 (EP);
F16M11/2064 (EP);
F16M11/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/07] | Title | German: | GEWICHTSAUSGLEICHSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE VERSETZBARE, GEGEBENENFALLS VERÄNDERLICHE LAST, MIT EINER REIBUNGSEINRICHTUNG ZUM FESTLEGEN DER LAST | [1992/27] | English: | DEVICE FOR BALANCING A DISPLACABLE LOAD, POSSIBLY VARIABLE, COMPRISING A FRICTION SYSTEM FOR IMMOBILIZING SAID LOAD | [1990/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF EQUILIBRATEUR D'UNE CHARGE DEPLA ABLE, EVENTUELLEMENT VARIABLE, COMPRENANT UN SYSTEME DE FRICTION POUR IMMOBILISER LADITE CHARGE | [1990/07] |
Former [1990/07] | GEWICHTAUSGLEICHSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE VERSETZBARE, GEGEBENEFALLS VERÄNDERLICHE LAST, MIT EINER REIBUNGSEINRICHTUNG ZUM FESTLEGEN DER LAST | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1989 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.1989 | Examination requested [1990/07] | 21.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/16] | 25.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2490125 [ ]; | GB980314 [ ]; | US4107769 [ ]; | US4134703 [ ]; | US1999844 [ ]; | US2861767 [ ]; | US1573799 [ ]; | BE519451 [ ] |