EP0393145 - SPONTANEOUS VESICULATION OF MULTILAMELLAR LIPOSOMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE LIPOSOME COMPANY, INC. One Research Way Princeton Forrestal Center Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states THE LIPOSOME COMPANY, INC. One Research Way Princeton Forrestal Center Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MADDEN, Thomas, D. 5, 1053 Nicola Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6G 2E1 / CA | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89901663.8 | 22.12.1988 | [1990/43] | WO1988US04632 | Priority number, date | US19870136267 | 22.12.1987 Original published format: US 136267 | US19880236700 | 25.08.1988 Original published format: US 236700 | [1990/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8905636 | Date: | 29.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0393145 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.06.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/66, A61K37/22, B01J13/02 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
A61K9/1277 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | SPONTANE VESIKELBILDUNG VON MULTILAMELLAREN LIPOSOMEN | [1990/43] | English: | SPONTANEOUS VESICULATION OF MULTILAMELLAR LIPOSOMES | [1990/43] | French: | VESICULATION SPONTANEE DE LIPOSOMES MULTILAMELLAIRES | [1990/43] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.1990 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.1990 | Search fee paid | 21.06.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 27.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/05] | 02.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4663167 | International search | [XP]US4762720 ; | [Y]US4515736 ; | [X]US4673567 ; | [A]US4310505 ; | [A]US4619794 | [A] - Proc. Natl. Acad, Sci. USA, Vol. 79, pages 1683-1687, March 1982, Biochemistry, HAUSER et al., "Spontaneous Vesiculation of Phospholipids: A Simple and Quick Method of Forming Unilamellar Vesicles". |