EP0396613 - CYANO-DIENES, HALOPYRIDINES, INTERMEDIATES AND A PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1991 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIANG, George, Chih-Shu 107 Banbury Drive Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | 02 /
GRANCHELLI, Felix, Edward 120 Spring Street Arlington, MA 02173 / US | 03 /
WRIGHT, Christopher 98 Jacques Street Somerville, MA 02145 / US | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89901789.1 | 03.01.1989 | [1990/46] | WO1989US00001 | Priority number, date | US19880140673 | 04.01.1988 Original published format: US 140673 | US19880232535 | 16.08.1988 Original published format: US 232535 | [1990/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8906230 | Date: | 13.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0396613 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C147/02, C07C121/417, C07D213/82, C07D213/71 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07C255/23 (EP,US);
C07C317/46 (EP,US);
C07D213/71 (EP,US);
C07D317/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/46] | Title | German: | CYANO-DIENE, HALOPYRIDINE, ZWISCHENVERBINDUNGEN UND EIN VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1990/46] | English: | CYANO-DIENES, HALOPYRIDINES, INTERMEDIATES AND A PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [1990/46] | French: | CYANO-DIENES, HALOPYRIDINES, INTERMEDIAIRES ET UN PROCEDE DE LEUR PREPARATION | [1990/46] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/02: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 89300006.7/0323881 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 22.11.91 | EPB 1992/02: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 89300006.7/0323881 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 22.11.91 | EPB 1992/02: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 89300006.7/0323881 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 22.11.91 | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.05.1990 | Examination requested [1991/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE1595900 [ ] (LAB U P S A) | [A] - Journal of Organic Chemistry, volume 39, no. 23, 1974, (Columbus, Ohio, US), T.A. Bryson et al.: "Biological probes. II. Ring labeled nicotinamide"pages 3436-3438 | [A] - Journal of Organic Chemistry, volume 41, no. 11, 1976, (Columbus, Ohio, US), T.A. Bryson et al.: "Biological probes. 3. Methods for carbon-4 and carbon-5 labeling in nicotinamide"pages 2066-2067 | [A] - Chemical Abstracts, volume 94, 1981, (Columbus, Ohio, US)see page 680 |