EP0348490 - TREATMENT OF TYPE 2 DIABETES MELLITUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 9373 Towne Centre Drive, Suite 250 San Diego California 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 9373 Towne Centre Drive, Suite 250 San Diego California 92121 / US | ||
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states AMYLIN CORPORATION 12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 250 San Diego California 92130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOPER, Garth, James, Smith The Cardinal's Hat Chaucer's Lane Woodstock Oxon OX7 1SR / GB | 02 /
GREENE, Howard, E. 6336 Calle del Alcazar Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89901802.2 | 11.01.1989 | [1990/01] | WO1989US00049 | Priority number, date | US19880142447 | 11.01.1988 Original published format: US 142447 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8906135 | Date: | 13.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348490 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348490 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.07.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, C07K7/08, C07K14/00 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
C07K16/26 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07K14/575 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
H01L2924/01023 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/01] | A61K37/02, C07K7/08, C07K7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/01] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES MELLITUS TYP 2 | [1990/01] | English: | TREATMENT OF TYPE 2 DIABETES MELLITUS | [1990/01] | French: | TRAITEMENT DU DIABETE SUCRE DU TYPE 2 | [1990/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.1989 | Search fee paid | 27.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 10.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/38] | Request for further processing for: | 25.11.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 25.11.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0270376 (TOYO JOZO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0289287 (AMYLIN CORP [US]) | International search | [X] - Biological Abstracts, Vol. 84, issued 01 November 1987 (CLARK), "Islet Amyloid Formed from Diabetes Associated Peptide maybe Pathogenic in Type-2 Diabetes". Abstract No. 86506. | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 109, issued 05 December 1988 (Columbus, Oh.) "Pancreatic Amylin and Calcitonin Gene-Related Peptide cause Resistance to Insulin in Skeletal Muscle in Vitro". (LEIGHTON) Abstract No. 205686u | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 110, issued 02 January 1989 (Columbus, Oh.) "Amylin found in Amyloid Deposits in Human Type 2 Diabetes Mellitus may be a Hormone that Regulates Glycogen Metabolism in Skeletal Muscle". (COOPER) Abstract No. 5630e. | Examination | - "Pancreatic Amylin and Calcitonin Gene-Related Peptide cause Resistance toInsulin in Skeletal Muscle in Vitro". (LEIGHTON) Abstract No. 205686u |