EP0461106 - USER-VARIABLE CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROYSHER, Martin 26-8 Woodlake Road Albany, NY 12203 / US | [1991/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89902150.5 | 28.02.1989 | [1991/51] | WO1989US00284 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009750 | Date: | 07.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0461106 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0461106 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.09.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47C3/00, A47C7/32, A47C4/02 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
A47C4/022 (EP,US);
A47C4/03 (EP,US);
A47C7/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/51] | A47C3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/51] | Title | German: | FÜR DEN BENUTZER EINSTELLBARER SESSEL | [1991/51] | English: | USER-VARIABLE CHAIR | [1991/51] | French: | SIEGE REGLABLE SELON L'UTILISATEUR | [1991/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.1991 | Search fee paid | 13.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 23.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.1995 | NL | 06.12.1995 | LU | 29.02.1996 | SE | 06.03.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
LU | 29.02.1996 | ||
SE | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
SE | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | SE | 06.03.1996 | Cited in | International search | US87644 [ ]; | US133847 [ ]; | US151617 [ ]; | US168501 [ ]; | US168993 [ ]; | US2507609 [ ] (MILES THOMAS J); | US3598444 [ ] (SEITER SARAH H); | GB1382834 [ ] (ARENSON A LTD); | US4192547 [ ] (GEIER JAMES M [US]) |