EP0402371 - HIGH-Tc SUPERCONDUCTOR AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/51] | HIGH-T c? SUPERCONDUCTOR AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING IT | ||
[1995/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIER, Joachim Im Kazenloch 102 D-7135 Wiernsheim / DE | 02 /
RABENAU, Albrecht Knappenweg 21b D-7000 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
MURUGARAJ, Pandijan Botnangerstrasse 52 D-7000 Stuttgart / DE | [1990/51] | Application number, filing date | 89902518.3 | 22.02.1989 | [1990/51] | WO1989EP00163 | Priority number, date | DE19883805954 | 25.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3805954 | [1990/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8908330 | Date: | 08.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0402371 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0402371 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0402371 | Date: | 20.07.1995 | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/12, H01L39/24, C04B35/00 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
C04B35/4504 (EP,US);
H10N60/857 (EP,US);
C04B35/4521 (EP,US);
H10N60/0268 (EP,US);
Y10S505/725 (EP,US);
Y10S505/775 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/03] |
Former [1990/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | HOCH-Tc-SUPRALEITER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1995/21] | English: | HIGH-Tc SUPERCONDUCTOR AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING IT | [1995/21] | French: | SUPRACONDUCTEUR A HAUTE TEMPERATURE Tc ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1995/21] |
Former [1990/51] | HOCH-T c?-SUPRALEITER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [1990/51] | HIGH-T c? SUPERCONDUCTOR AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING IT | ||
Former [1990/51] | SUPRACONDUCTEUR A HAUTE TEMPERATURE T c? ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1990 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/51] | 16.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0277749 [ ] (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | EP0287325 [ ] (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [X] - Physical Review Letters, Band 58, Nr. 9, Mäarz 1987 (New York, US) M.K. Wu Et al.: "Superconductivity at 93K in a new mixid phase Y-Ba-Cu-O comound system at ambient pressure ", Seiten 908-910 |