Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0364593
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
07.03.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
14.02.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.1997 [1997/14] |
15.03.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] |
29.02.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.02.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.12.1994 |
First examination report |
|
30.07.1993 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] |
22.07.1993 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.09.1993 [1993/36] |
22.07.1993 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.09.1993 [1993/36] |
10.03.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.04.1990 [1990/17] |
10.03.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.04.1990 [1990/17] |