EP0402372 - GENERATING A MESH FOR FINITE ELEMENT ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.1992 [1992/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mentor Graphics Corporation 8500 S.W. Creekside Place Beaverton, Oregon 97005-7191 / US | [1990/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, Jonathan 5718 Charles Circle Lake Oswego, OR 97035 / US | 02 /
FORTNER, Patrick, D. 10010 S.W. 135th Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | Meddle, Alan Leonard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 89902579.5 | 27.01.1989 | [1990/51] | WO1989US00357 | Priority number, date | US19880151105 | 01.02.1988 Original published format: US 151105 | [1990/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8907301 | Date: | 10.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0402372 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.08.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/62, G06K9/48 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
G06T17/20 (EP,US);
G06F30/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/51] | Title | German: | ERMITTLUNG EINES ANALYSEMASTERS ENDIGER ELEMENTEN | [1990/51] | English: | GENERATING A MESH FOR FINITE ELEMENT ANALYSIS | [1990/51] | French: | GENERATION DE GRILLE D'ANALYSE D'ELEMENTS FINIS | [1990/51] | File destroyed: | 22.02.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.1990 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.1990 | Search fee paid | 01.08.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 01.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/51] | 03.05.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - PATTERN RECOGNITION. vol. 20, no. 5, 1987, NEW YORKUS pages 525 - 533; A. GOSHTASBY: 'Piecewise cubic mapping functions for image registration' | International search | [YP]US4797842 (NACKMAN LEE R [US], et al); | [YP]US4791583 (COLBURN STEPHEN [US]); | [YP]US4766556 (ARAKAWA YOSHIKI [JP]); | [YP]US4742473 (SHUGAR JOEL K [US], et al); | [YP]US4649498 (KEDEM GERSHON [US], et al); | [YP]US4646251 (HAYES ALAN B [US], et al); | [Y]US4628532 (STONE DAVID H [US], et al); | [AP]US4775946 (ANJYO KENICHI [JP]); | [AP]US4771474 (TAKASHIMA MASATAKE [JP], et al); | [AP]US4748675 (SUZUKI KENJI [JP], et al); | [AP]US4736306 (CHRISTENSEN NOEL C [US], et al); | [A]US4700402 (OKAI TSUKASA [JP], et al) |