EP0397791 - CENTRIFUGAL PUMP HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄFER, Horst Kurze Strasse 3 D-2730 Rhade / DE | 02 /
BEISS, Günter Schneidhainer Strasse 4 D-2800 Bremen 44 / DE | [1990/47] | Application number, filing date | 89902639.7 | 10.02.1989 | [1990/47] | WO1989EP00124 | Priority number, date | DE19883806349 | 27.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3806349 | [1990/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8908194 | Date: | 08.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0397791 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397791 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/42 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
F04D29/426 (EP,US);
F04D29/605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/47] | Title | German: | KREISELPUMPENGEHÄUSE | [1990/47] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL PUMP HOUSING | [1990/47] | French: | CARTER DE POMPE CENTRIFUGE | [1990/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.1990 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 24.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.02.1992 | CH | 29.02.1992 | LI | 29.02.1992 | LU | 29.02.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1994/18] | AT | 10.02.1992 | |
CH | 29.02.1992 | ||
LI | 29.02.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | CH | 29.02.1992 | |
LI | 29.02.1992 | Cited in | International search | [X]BE385893 ; | [A]FR488377 (ESCHER WYSS & CIE CONST MEC [CH]); | [A]GB190894 (DRYSDALE & CO LTD, et al); | [A]GB191201639 (WATSON HENRY BURNETT, et al); | [A]GB317660 (HATHORN DAVEY AND COMPANY LTD, et al) |