EP0410968 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE PROJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.1993 [1993/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LASER 681 S.R.L. Via Podgora 12 A I-20122 Milano / IT | [1992/19] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states LASER 681 S.R.L. Viale Tunisia, 16 I-20124 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORLANDI, Raul, Maria Via Metauro, 5 I-20100 Milano / IT | [1991/06] | Representative(s) | Arena, Giovanni Viale Certosa 135 20151 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | Arena, Giovanni Viale Certosa 135 I-20151 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89902659.5 | 23.02.1989 | [1991/06] | WO1989IT00009 | Priority number, date | IT19880020053 | 31.03.1988 Original published format: IT 2005388 | IT19880023069 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: IT 2306988 | [1991/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8909423 | Date: | 05.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0410968 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410968 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/22, G03B35/00, G02B27/02 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
G03B35/00 (EP);
G02B30/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/06] | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALER BILDPROJEKTOR | [1991/06] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE PROJECTOR | [1991/06] | French: | PROJECTEUR D'IMAGES EN TROIS DIMENSIONS | [1991/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/12] | 14.05.1991 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1991 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4671625 [ ] (NOBLE LOWELL A [US]); | GB675549 [ ] (COPELAND JACOB C); | DE2612566 [ ] (RUSTERHOLZ WERNER); | DE3013959 [ ] (SAUL KG [DE]); | US4120563 [ ] (STEFANOU JOHN); | US4623223 [ ] (KEMPF PAUL S); | GB2155651 [ ] (NIGHTINGALE PETER COLIN ROY) | Examination | DE26125669U |