EP0358744 - VIBRATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1997 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 11 26, Münchener Strasse 31 D-85081 Reichertshofen / DE | [1990/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEDL, Franz Hofenfelsstra e 3 D-8000 München 19 / DE | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Hieke, Kurt Stadlerstrasse 3 85540 Haar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | Hieke, Kurt Stadlerstrasse 3 D-85540 Haar / DE | Application number, filing date | 89902787.4 | 03.03.1989 | [1990/12] | WO1989EP00222 | Priority number, date | DE19883806897 | 03.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3806897 | [1990/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8907988 | Date: | 08.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0358744 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358744 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/16 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
B06B1/164 (EP,US);
B06B1/166 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18344 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/12] | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSERREGER | [1990/12] | English: | VIBRATOR | [1990/12] | French: | GENERATEUR DE VIBRATIONS | [1990/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.1989 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1991 | 31.03.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1997/17] | FR | 22.11.1996 | Cited in | International search | DE1078058 [ ] (LOSENHAUSENWERK DUESSELDORFER); | DE1285777 [ ] (LOSENHAUSEN MASCHINENBAU AG); | DE2909204 [ ] |