EP0362326 - TRACKLAYING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZEPF, Hans-Rudolf Glärnischstrasse 15 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [1990/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Postfach 12 50 78229 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer.nat. Dr. Peter Weiss & Partner Postfach 12 50 D-78229 Engen / DE | ||
Former [1991/02] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Hedwigsteig 6 Postfach 95 CH-8029 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1990/15] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Hedwigsteig 6 Postfach 95 CH-8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 89903077.9 | 21.03.1989 | [1990/15] | WO1989CH00057 | Priority number, date | CH19880001104 | 23.03.1988 Original published format: CH 110488 | [1990/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8909105 | Date: | 05.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0362326 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0362326 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0362326 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B21K23/02, B21L9/02, B62D55/32, B62D55/20 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
B21K23/02 (EP,US);
B22C9/30 (EP,US);
B62D55/20 (EP,US);
B62D55/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | RAUPENFAHRZEUG | [1990/15] | English: | TRACKLAYING VEHICLE | [1990/15] | French: | VEHICULE A CHENILLES | [1990/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.1989 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 22.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.1994
23.03.1994
ADMISSIBLE Diehl GmbH & Co. Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Hofmann, Gerhard Patentassessor c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. Zentrale Patentabteilung Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.1994
23.03.1994
ADMISSIBLE Diehl GmbH & Co. Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Hofmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentassessor c/o Diehl GmbH & Co., Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1994/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.1994
Diehl GmbH & Co. Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | 16.03.1994 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 18.03.1994 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 25.05.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.09.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.09.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.01.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.02.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.07.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 09.06.1993 | SE | 09.06.1993 | AT | 21.03.1994 | BE | 31.03.1994 | CH | 31.03.1994 | LI | 31.03.1994 | LU | 31.03.1994 | FR | 31.03.1995 | [2008/40] |
Former [2000/06] | NL | 09.06.1993 | |
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
AT | 21.03.1994 | ||
BE | 31.03.1994 | ||
CH | 31.03.1994 | ||
LI | 31.03.1994 | ||
LU | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/40] | NL | 09.06.1993 | |
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
AT | 21.03.1994 | ||
BE | 31.03.1994 | ||
CH | 31.03.1994 | ||
LI | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | NL | 09.06.1993 | |
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
BE | 31.03.1994 | ||
CH | 31.03.1994 | ||
LI | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | NL | 09.06.1993 | |
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1994 | ||
LI | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1994/09] | NL | 09.06.1993 | |
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/01] | NL | 09.06.1993 | Cited in | International search | GB373770 [ ] (CLEVELAND TRACTOR CO); | US4175797 [ ] (KREKELER CLAUDE B [US]) |