EP0448551 - POWER LINE TO DRIVE A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS plc Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JARVIS, Roger, Porter 87 Lime Avenue Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 7DG / GB | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Stanley, Michael Gordon, et al Automotive Products plc Patent Department Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Stanley, Michael Gordon, et al Automotive Products plc Patent Department Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV31 3ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 89903196.7 | 31.01.1989 | [1991/40] | WO1989GB00089 | Priority number, date | GB19880010365 | 30.04.1988 Original published format: GB 8810365 | [1991/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8910282 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0448551 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0448551 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/08 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
F16D48/068 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (KR);
F16D48/066 (EP,US);
F16H63/44 (EP,US);
F16H63/46 (EP,US);
B60W2710/023 (EP,US);
B60W2710/025 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1024 (EP,US);
F16D2500/10412 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3144 (EP,US);
F16D2500/31466 (EP,US);
F16D2500/50236 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70258 (EP,US);
F16D2500/7027 (EP,US);
F16D2500/7041 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70442 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70454 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/40] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSTRANG ZUM ANTREIBEN EINES FAHRZEUGES | [1991/40] | English: | POWER LINE TO DRIVE A VEHICLE | [1991/40] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION POUR L'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN VEHICULE | [1991/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1990 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 02.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.11.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   30.11.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0189050 [ ] (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]); | US4533030 [ ] (GABRIEL ALBERT L [US]); | DE3334710 [ ] (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]); | DE2609213 [ ] (NISSAN MOTOR) |