EP0407414 - CATALYST FOR GROUP TRANSFER POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DICKER, Ira, Bernard 1016 Jeffrey Road Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89903556.2 | 15.03.1989 | [1991/03] | WO1989US00972 | Priority number, date | US19880176808 | 01.04.1988 Original published format: US 176808 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8909236 | Date: | 05.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0407414 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0407414 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/42, C08F20/00, C08F22/40 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
C08F4/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/03] | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR FÜR GRUPPENÜBERTRAGUNGSPOLYMERISIERUNG | [1991/03] | English: | CATALYST FOR GROUP TRANSFER POLYMERIZATION | [1991/03] | French: | CATALYSEUR POUR POLYMERISATION PAR TRANSFERT DE GROUPE | [1991/03] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0083018 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | EP0145263 [ ] (DU PONT [US]); | US4588795 [ ] (DICKER IRA B [US], et al); | EP0190631 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]) | Examination | US4581428 |