EP0415938 - MASTER PART AND RELEVANT MANUFACTURING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARPOSS SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Saliceto 13 40010 Bentivoglio BO / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states MARPOSS SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Saliceto 13 I-40010 Bentivoglio BO / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POSSATI, Mario Viale Carducci, 23 I-40125 Bologna / IT | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Miniucchi, Silvio c/o Marposs S.p.A. Via Saliceto 13 40010 Bentivoglio (Bologna) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Miniucchi, Silvio c/o Marposs S.p.A. Via Saliceto 13 I-40010 Bentivoglio (Bologna) / IT | Application number, filing date | 89903731.1 | 22.03.1989 | [1991/11] | WO1989EP00314 | Priority number, date | IT19880003423 | 21.04.1988 Original published format: IT 342388 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8910530 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0415938 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415938 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01B3/14, B23Q5/42, B23Q16/00, G01B5/20 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
B23Q16/001 (EP,US);
G01B3/14 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q35/42 (EP,US);
G01B5/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/11] | Title | German: | MEISTER-BAUTEIL UND EINSCHLÄGIGES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1991/11] | English: | MASTER PART AND RELEVANT MANUFACTURING PROCESS | [1991/11] | French: | PIECE GABARIT ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [1991/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1990 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.07.1990 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 28.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | CH308630 [ ] (OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG [CH]); | DE2320918 [ ] (RUECKLE KG HERMANN); | FR2248487 [ ] (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]); | GB1565061 [ ] (BRITISH LEYLAND CARS LTD); | GB2036328 [ ] (VICKERS E); | WO8404720 [ ] (BOEING CO [US]) | Examination | US2537340 |