EP0364547 - LAMINAR MATERIAL OR WORKPIECE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLYCO-METALL-WERKE Glyco B.V. & Co. KG Stielstrasse 11, Postfach 13 03 35 D-65091 Wiesbaden-Schierstein / DE | [1993/11] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states GLYCO-METALL-WERKE Glyco B.V. & Co. KG Stielstrasse 11 D-65201 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states Glyco-Metall-Werke Daelen & Loos GmbH Stielstrasse 11 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGEL, Ulrich Breslauer Str. 2a D-6208 Bad Schwalbach / DE | 02 /
WEGNER, Karl-Heinz Hamsterweg 10 D-6208 Bad Schwalbach / DE | [1990/17] | Application number, filing date | 89904012.5 | 13.04.1989 | [1990/17] | WO1989DE00219 | Priority number, date | DE19883813803 | 23.04.1988 Original published format: DE 3813803 | [1990/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8910422 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0364547 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0364547 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12, F16C33/14 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
C23C4/134 (EP);
F16C33/14 (EP);
F16C2223/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/17] | Title | German: | SCHICHTWERKSTOFF ODER SCHICHTWERKSTÜCK UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1990/17] | English: | LAMINAR MATERIAL OR WORKPIECE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM | [1990/17] | French: | MATERIAU OU PIECE STRATIFIES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1990/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1989 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.1991 | 04.05.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.08.1992 | 30.04.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   02.07.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.09.1993 | NL | 22.09.1993 | SE | 22.09.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 22.09.1993 | |
NL | 22.09.1993 | ||
SE | 22.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 22.09.1993 | |
SE | 22.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | SE | 22.09.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP54103752 ; | FR2230753 [ ] (WELLWORTHY LTD [GB]); | DE1521372 [ ] (METCO INC); | DE906530 [ ] (DEGUSSA); | DE3621184 [ ] (GLYCO METALL WERKE [DE]); | US4297388 [ ] (KUMAR KAPLESH, et al); | DE2615022 [ ] (AGEFKO KOHLENSAEURE IND) | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Band 3, Nr. 123 (C-61), 16. Oktober 1979; & JP-A-54103752 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K.) 15. August 1979, & JP54103752 A 00000000 | Examination | WO8800251 | - Römpps Chemie Lexikon, 8. Aufl., Bd. 1, Seite 26 | by applicant | DE2656203 | WO8800251 |