EP0403563 - ION MOBILITY DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graseby Dynamics Limited Odhams Trading Estate St. Albans Road Wartford Hertfordshire WD2 5JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states Graseby Dynamics Limited Odhams Trading Estate St. Albans Road Wartford Hertfordshire WD2 5JX / GB | ||
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states GRASEBY IONICS LTD Odhams Trading Estate St. Albans Road Wartford Hertfordshire WD2 5JX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKE, James, Rhodri 95 Victoria Street Dunstable Bedfordshire LU6 3A2 / GB | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | ||
Former [1990/52] | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89904181.8 | 29.03.1989 | [1990/52] | WO1989GB00317 | Priority number, date | GB19880007994 | 06.04.1988 Original published format: GB 8807994 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8909934 | Date: | 19.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0403563 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0403563 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/64 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
G01N27/622 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1990/52] | Title | German: | IONENBEWEGLICHKEITSDETEKTOR | [1990/52] | English: | ION MOBILITY DETECTOR | [1990/52] | French: | DETECTEUR DE MOBILITE D'IONS | [1990/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.1990 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0026683 [ ] (BENDIX CORP [US]); | EP0046699 [ ] (BENDIX CORP [US]); | EP0057076 [ ] (HONEYWELL INC [US]) |