EP0462102 - A METHOD FOR DETECTING EXTERNAL INFLUENCE ON AN OPTICAL CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KARLSSON, Stefan Rönnbärsgatan 2 S-590 50 Vikingstad / SE | [1991/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/52] | Representative(s) | Hedefält, Dag, et al Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten 115 88 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Hedefält, Dag, et al Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten S-115 88 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1991/52] | Hedefält, Dag Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten S-115 88 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 89904269.1 | 09.03.1989 | [1991/52] | WO1989SE00116 | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9010921 | Date: | 20.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0462102 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0462102 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/18, H04B10/12, G01L1/24 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
G08B13/186 (EP,US);
G02B6/4469 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS EINES EXTERNEN EINFLUSSES AUF EIN OPTISCHES KABEL | [1991/52] | English: | A METHOD FOR DETECTING EXTERNAL INFLUENCE ON AN OPTICAL CABLE | [1991/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION D'INFLUENCES EXTERIEURES SUR DES CABLES A FIBRES OPTIQUES | [1994/41] |
Former [1991/52] | PROCEDE DE DETECTION D'INFLUENCES EXTERIEURES SUR DES C BLES A FIBRES OPTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1990 | Translation filed | 26.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 31.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 19.01.1995 | [1995/29] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4297684 (BUTTER CHARLES D); | [A]US4480916 (BAREKET NOAH [US], et al); | [A]US4495411 (RASHLEIGH SCOTT C [US]); | [A]US4525626 (KUSH STEPHEN T [US], et al); | [A]US4583855 (BAREKET NOAH [US]); | [A]US4653915 (FRIGO NICHOLAS J [US], et al) |