EP0373195 - COMPOSITION FOR INCREASING MELANIN CONTENT OF MELANOCYTES IN-VIVO AND IN-VITRO AND METHODS FOR THE IN-VITRO USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/25] | METHODS FOR INCREASING MELANIN CONTENT AND FOR INDUCING MELANOCYTE PROLIFERATION IN-VIVO AND IN-VITRO | ||
[1994/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRUSTEES OF BOSTON UNIVERSITY 590 Commonwealth Avenue Boston, MA 02215 / US | [1993/40] |
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE Packard Hall Medford, MA 02155 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILCHREST, Barbara, A. 67 Walnut Place Brookline, MA 02146 / US | 02 /
GORDON, Philip, R. 456 Centre Street, No. 3 Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89904310.3 | 27.03.1989 | [1990/25] | WO1989US01265 | Priority number, date | US19880175179 | 30.03.1988 Original published format: US 175179 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8909258 | Date: | 05.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0373195 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0373195 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.10.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/606 (EP);
A61K8/64 (EP);
A61K8/983 (EP);
A61K8/985 (EP);
A61Q19/02 (EP);
A61Q19/04 (EP);
A61Q5/00 (EP);
A61Q5/10 (EP);
C12N5/0626 (EP);
C12N2500/25 (EP);
C12N2501/01 (EP);
C12N2501/11 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/25] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR IN-VIVO BZW. IN-VITRO STEIGERUNG DES MELANINGEHALTES DER MELANOCYTEN UND DEREN IN-VITRO VERWENDUNG | [1994/24] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR INCREASING MELANIN CONTENT OF MELANOCYTES IN-VIVO AND IN-VITRO AND METHODS FOR THE IN-VITRO USE THEREOF | [1994/24] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR ACCROITRE IN-VIVO OU IN-VITRO LA TENEUR EN MELANINE DES MELANOCYTES ET METHODES POUR UTILISER LA DITE COMPOSITION | [1994/24] |
Former [1990/25] | VERFAHREN ZUR STEIGERUNG DES MELANINGEHALTES UND ZUR INDUZIERUNG DER MELANOZYTENVERMEHRUNG IN VIVO UND IN VITRO | ||
Former [1990/25] | METHODS FOR INCREASING MELANIN CONTENT AND FOR INDUCING MELANOCYTE PROLIFERATION IN-VIVO AND IN-VITRO | ||
Former [1990/25] | PROCEDES D'AUGMENTATION DE TENEUR EN MELANINE ET INDUISANT LA PROLIFERATION DE MELANOCYTES IN VIVO ET IN VITRO | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1989 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1989 | Search fee paid | 24.11.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1989 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 17.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - ANN. NY. ACAD. SCI., vol. 548, 1988, pages 180-190; R. HALABAN et al.: "Paracrine stimulation of melanocytes by keratinocytes through basic fibroblast growth factor" | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 1, 2nd January 1984, page 113, abstract no. 1293t, Columbus, Ohio, US; B.A. GILCHREST et al.: "Autocrine and paracrine growth stimulation of cells derived from human skin", & J. CELL. PHYSIOL. 1983, 117(2), 235-40 | International search | [X] - Journal of Cellular Physiology, 122, (3). 1985 pgs 350-3619 "The Stimulation of Normal Human Melanocyte Proliferation In-Vitro by Melanocyte Growth from Human Brain". |