Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK599189D0 | 28.11.1989 | D0 | DK599189 | 28.11.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US17469888 | 29.03.1988 | US8901262 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR900700884 | 17.08.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US17469888 | 29.03.1988 | US8901262 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO894709L | 24.11.1989 | L | NO894709D0 | 24.11.1989 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US17469888 | 29.03.1988 | US8901262 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8909403 | Global Dossier | 05.10.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17469888 | 29.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3413989 | Global Dossier | 16.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US17469888 | 29.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0364560 | Global Dossier | 05.12.1990 | A4 | EP0364560 | 25.04.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17469888 | 29.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH02504395 | 13.12.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US17469888 | 29.03.1988 |