EP0359816 - DUAL-TAPER, ASYMMETRIC HOLE PLACEMENT IN RECONSTRUCTION AND FRACTURE PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York West 116th Street and Broadway New York New York 10027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK West 116th Street and Broadway New York, New York 10027 / US | ||
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York West 116th Street and Broadway New York, NY 10027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAWLUK, Robert, J. 8 Valemont Road Montvale, NJ 07645 / US | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89904928.2 | 31.03.1989 | [1990/13] | WO1989US01362 | Priority number, date | US19880176651 | 01.04.1988 Original published format: US 176651 | [1990/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8909037 | Date: | 05.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0359816 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.10.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/04 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/80 (EP,US);
Y10S606/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/13] | Title | German: | IN BREITE UND DICKE SPITZZULAUFENDE REKONSTRUKTIONS- UND FRAKTURPLATTE MIT ASYMMETRISCHER LOCKANORDNUNG | [1990/13] | English: | DUAL-TAPER, ASYMMETRIC HOLE PLACEMENT IN RECONSTRUCTION AND FRACTURE PLATES | [1990/13] | French: | PLAQUES DE RECONSTRUCTION ET DE CONTENTION A DOUBLE CONICITE ET A AGENCEMENT ASYMETRIQUE DES TROUS | [1990/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1989 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1989 | Search fee paid | 29.12.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 26.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/51] | 07.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2367479 (BAZELAIRE ERIC DE [FR]); | [Y]FR2555902 (FRANCE IMPLANT EST [FR]) | International search | [Y]US4683878 (CARTER DENNIS R [US]) |