Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] |
20.02.1992 | First examination report | |
22.11.1990 | Change - applicant | published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] |
20.08.1990 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.10.1990 [1990/41] |
10.04.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] |
16.02.1990 | Change - representative | published on 04.04.1990 [1990/14] |
10.02.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.03.1990 [1990/13] |