Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK608689D0 | 01.12.1989 | D0 | DK608689 | 01.12.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US17665188 | 01.04.1988 | US8901362 | 31.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8909037 | Global Dossier | 05.10.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17665188 | 01.04.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3428589 | Global Dossier | 16.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US17665188 | 01.04.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0359816 | Global Dossier | 10.10.1990 | A4 | EP0359816 | 28.03.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17665188 | 01.04.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH02503877 | 15.11.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US17665188 | 01.04.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4955886 | 11.09.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US17665188 | 01.04.1988 |