EP0424395 - THREAD STOP-MOTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.M. PFAFF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Königstrasse 154 67655 Kaiserslautern / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states G.M. PFAFF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Königstrasse 154 D-67655 Kaiserslautern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNOLD, Kurt Auf dem Bännjerrück 19 D-6750 Kaiserslautern / DE | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Klein, Friedrich, et al Auf der Pirsch 11 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Klein, Friedrich, et al Auf der Pirsch 11 D-67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | Application number, filing date | 89905082.7 | 28.04.1989 | [1991/18] | WO1989EP00472 | Priority number, date | DE19883818663 | 01.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3818663 | [1991/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8912124 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0424395 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0424395 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D05B1/00 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
D05B51/00 (EP,US);
D05B1/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | IT [1991/18] | Title | German: | FADENWÄCHTER | [1991/18] | English: | THREAD STOP-MOTION DEVICE | [1991/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE DE FIL | [1991/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/18] | 31.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB826488 (PFAFF AG G M); | [A]CH368697 (ALGE JOSEF [AT]); | [A]US4215641 (DOBRJANSKYJ LEO [US], et al); | [A]DE3120355 (CSEPEL MUEVEK JARMUE [HU]); | [A]DD228843 (BEKLEIDUNGSWERKE VEB [DD]); | [A]US4566396 (SAKUMA KUNIHARU [JP], et al) |