EP0419497 - STARTING APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLENZ, Klaus Richard-Wagner-Str. 26 D-7141 Schwieberdingen / DE | 02 /
WUERTH, Hans Wilhelm-Bloss-Str. 67 D-7140 Ludwigsburg / DE | [1991/14] | Application number, filing date | 89905628.7 | 20.05.1989 | [1991/14] | WO1989DE00319 | Priority number, date | DE19883819219 | 06.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3819219 | [1991/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8912164 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419497 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0419497 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/08 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
F02N11/0851 (EP,US);
F02N11/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | ANDREHVORRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN | [1991/14] | English: | STARTING APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [1991/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DEMARRAGE POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1991/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 24.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR816532 (BOSCH ROBERT); | [A]DE704133 (FIAT SPA); | [A]FR2223565 (CAV LTD [GB]) |