Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR930002718B | 09.04.1993 | B1 | KR900702327 | 06.12.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8900506 | 22.05.1989 | JP13214488 | 30.05.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8912213 | Global Dossier | 14.12.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP13214488 | 30.05.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0369031 | Global Dossier | 08.09.1993 | B1 | EP0369031 | 27.12.1991 | A4 | EP0369031 | 23.05.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP13214488 | 30.05.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE68909004T | 05.01.1994 | T2 | DE68909004D1 | 14.10.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP13214488 | 30.05.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2501227B | 29.05.1996 | B2 | JPH01301115 | 05.12.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP13214488 | 30.05.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5121116 | 09.06.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP13214488 | 30.05.1988 |