EP0369031 - ABSOLUTE POSITION ENCODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Mitsuyuki F. Manshon Hasimomi 8-205 3511-1, Shibokusa Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89905772.3 | 22.05.1989 | [1990/21] | WO1989JP00506 | Priority number, date | JP19880132144 | 30.05.1988 Original published format: JP 13214488 | [1990/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8912213 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0369031 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369031 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.12.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/249, G01D5/245, G01D5/36 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
G01D5/24476 (EP,US);
G01D5/249 (KR);
G01D5/24409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/21] | Title | German: | KODIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE ABSOLUTE LAGE | [1990/21] | English: | ABSOLUTE POSITION ENCODER | [1990/21] | French: | CODEUR DE POSITION ABSOLUE | [1990/21] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.1990 | Translation filed | 12.02.1990 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1990 | Search fee paid | 12.02.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.09.1993 | GB | 22.05.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/19] | FR | 28.01.1994 | |
GB | 22.05.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | FR | 28.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61131011 ; | [A]JP56096213 ; | [A]EP0218242 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 324 (P-512)November 5, 1986 & JP-A-61 131 011 (FUJITSU LTD ) June 18, 1986, & JP61131011 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 165 (P-085)October 22, 1981 & JP-A-56 096 213 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK ) August 4, 1981, & JP56096213 A 00000000 | International search | [A]JPH05696213 |