EP0414788 - MOUTHCARE-PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RODRISO HOLDING B.V. Kerkweg 217 NL-2985 AR Ridderkerk / NL | [1991/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOERMAN, Gerard Kerkweg 217 NL-2985 AR Ridderkerk / NL | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1991/10] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 89906197.2 | 09.05.1989 | [1991/10] | WO1989NL00033 | Priority number, date | NL19880001214 | 09.05.1988 Original published format: NL 8801214 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8910737 | Date: | 16.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0414788 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0414788 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/26 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/14 (EP);
A61K36/185 (EP);
A61K36/28 (EP);
A61K8/9761 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/14, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/28, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/09] |
Former [1991/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | MUNDVERSORGUNGSMITTEL | [1991/10] | English: | MOUTHCARE-PRODUCTS | [1991/10] | French: | PRODUITS D'HYGIENE BUCCALE | [1991/10] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/10: Verbunden mit 89201167.7/0341795 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 22.01.93 | EPB 1993/10: Consolidated with 89201167.7/0341795 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 22.01.93 | EPB 1993/10: Jointe à la demande no. 89201167.7/0341795 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 22.01.93 | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 08.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR741469 [ ] |