EP0415997 - MICROWAVE BALLOON ANGIOPLASTY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KASEVICH ASSOCIATES, INC. 175 V New Boston Street Woburn, MA 01888-1859 / US | [1991/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASEVICH, Raymond, S. 680 Wellesley Street Weston, MA 02193 / US | 02 /
McQUEENEY, James, F. 22 Birch Road Natick, MA 01760 / US | 03 /
CROOKER, Ronald, H. 116 Franklin Street Stoneham, MA 02180 / US | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89906235.0 | 18.05.1989 | [1991/11] | WO1989US02154 | Priority number, date | US19880195584 | 18.05.1988 Original published format: US 195584 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8911311 | Date: | 30.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0415997 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.11.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/04, A61B17/36 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
H01Q21/08 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00057 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00853 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22001 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22051 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22062 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00285 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00738 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1991/11] | A61N5/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/11] | Title | German: | MITTELS MIKROWELLEN AUFBLASBARER KATHETER FÜR ANGIOPLASTIE | [1991/11] | English: | MICROWAVE BALLOON ANGIOPLASTY | [1991/11] | French: | ANGIOPLASTIE PAR CATHETER GONFLABLE A MICRO-ONDES | [1991/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 06.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 01.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/23] | 03.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/23] | Request for further processing for: | 16.07.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 16.07.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.08.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.05.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.1991 | 31.05.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4700716 (KASEVICH RAYMOND S [US], et al) | International search | [A]US3230957 (GERHARD SEIFERT); | [Y]US4249445 (BROWNING RICHARD J [US]); | [A]US4583556 (HINES MARION E [US], et al); | [Y]US4612940 (KASEVICH RAYMOND S [US], et al); | [Y]US4643186 (ROSEN ARYE [US], et al); | [Y]US4658836 (TURNER PAUL F [US]); | [A]US4681122 (WINTERS ARTHUR [US], et al); | [X]GB1188490 (FRITZ KARL [DE]); | [Y]GB2122092 (SECR DEFENCE); | [Y]EP0105677 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3516830 (HUBMANN MAX, et al); | [Y]EP0251745 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) |