EP0419512 - INDUCTION HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastern Electricity plc P.O. Box 40 Wherstead, Ipswich, IP9 2AQ / GB | [1992/19] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states EASTERN ELECTRICITY BOARD P.O. Box 40, Wherstead Ipswich IP9 2AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CURRAN, John, Strothers 18 Valley Close Brantham Manningtree Essex / GB | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1991/14] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89906410.9 | 07.06.1989 | [1991/14] | WO1989GB00629 | Priority number, date | GB19880013437 | 07.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8813437 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8912204 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419512 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/10, H05B6/02 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
H05B6/108 (EP);
F24H1/101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | INDUKTIONSERHITZER | [1991/14] | English: | INDUCTION HEATER | [1991/14] | French: | FOUR A INDUCTION | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 22.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/30] | 08.03.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0075811 [ ] |