EP0440636 - EMERGENCY STAIRS FOR EXTERNAL MOUNTING ON BUILDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HISTI DEVELOPMENT AS Langmyra Industriomrade N-3185 Skoppum / NO | [1991/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSEN, Stig Jordbaervn.23 N-3000 Drammen / NO | [1991/33] | Representative(s) | Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89906480.2 | 12.05.1989 | [1991/33] | WO1989NO00048 | Priority number, date | NO19880002251 | 24.05.1988 Original published format: NO 882251 | [1991/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8911312 | Date: | 30.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440636 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440636 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A62B1/00, E06C9/00 | [1991/33] | CPC: |
A62B5/00 (EP,US);
E06C9/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/33] | Title | German: | NOTLEITER FÜR FIXIERUNG AN DER AUSSENSEITE VON GEBÄUDEN | [1991/33] | English: | EMERGENCY STAIRS FOR EXTERNAL MOUNTING ON BUILDINGS | [1991/33] | French: | ESCALIERS DE SECOURS DESTINES A ETRE MONTES A L'EXTERIEUR D'UN BATIMENT | [1991/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 26.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 20.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.1993 | BE | 20.01.1993 | CH | 20.01.1993 | IT | 20.01.1993 | LI | 20.01.1993 | NL | 20.01.1993 | LU | 31.05.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 20.01.1993 | |
BE | 20.01.1993 | ||
CH | 20.01.1993 | ||
IT | 20.01.1993 | ||
LI | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 20.01.1993 | |
BE | 20.01.1993 | ||
CH | 20.01.1993 | ||
LI | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 20.01.1993 | |
BE | 20.01.1993 | ||
CH | 20.01.1993 | ||
LI | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | BE | 20.01.1993 | |
CH | 20.01.1993 | ||
LI | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | CH | 20.01.1993 | |
LI | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/27] | CH | 20.01.1993 | |
LI | 20.01.1993 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US748305 (PARVIN CHARLES H [US], et al); | [A]US3951232 (OKADA SATOSHI); | [Y]EP0113329 (PARENT LEON); | [A]EP0151076 (COUTIER CHARLES ETS [FR]) |