EP0418294 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO WORK STATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.M. JACK ENGINEERING PTY. LIMITED 40 North Arm Road Middle Cove, NSW 2068 / AU | [1991/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEARSON, Graeme, Leslie, Stewart 40 North Arm Road Middle Cove, NSW 2068 / AU | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Jones, Ian, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | [2009/52] |
Former [1995/04] | Jones, Ian, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1991/13] | Jones, Ian W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89906677.3 | 18.05.1989 | [1991/13] | WO1989AU00221 | Priority number, date | AU19880008745 | 10.06.1988 Original published format: AU 874588 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8911922 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0418294 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0418294 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.12.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/025, B60P3/14 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
E04H5/06 (EP,US);
B60P3/025 (KR);
B60P3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/13] | Title | German: | ARBEITSPLÄTZE | [1991/13] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO WORK STATIONS | [1991/13] | French: | AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES STATIONS DE TRAVAIL | [1991/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 07.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.1993 | 31.05.1994 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.1995 | BE | 25.01.1995 | CH | 25.01.1995 | FR | 25.01.1995 | IT | 25.01.1995 | LI | 25.01.1995 | NL | 25.01.1995 | SE | 25.04.1995 | DE | 26.04.1995 | LU | 31.05.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
BE | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
IT | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
DE | 26.04.1995 | ||
LU | 31.05.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
BE | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
IT | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
DE | 26.04.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
BE | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
DE | 26.04.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
BE | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
DE | 26.04.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
BE | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
DE | 26.04.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
DE | 26.04.1995 | ||
FR | 23.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
DE | 26.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/32] | CH | 25.01.1995 | |
LI | 25.01.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB555026 (THOMAS EDWARD FOULKES); | [A]GB567449 (SIDNEY HOLE); | [A]US2784027 (TEMP CONRAD R); | [A]US2982578 (LOWE ROY E); | [A]FR1390044 ; | [X]FR2129090 (HUCHET RAYMOND); | [A]US4270319 (SPASOJEVIC RATKO) |