EP0420883 - TRICYCLIC 3-OXO-PROPANENITRILE DERIVATIVES AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FARMITALIA CARLO ERBA S.r.l. Via Carlo Imbonati 24 I-20159 Milano / IT | [1991/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORIA, Gianfederico Viale Abruzzi, 28 I-Milan / IT | 02 /
ISETTA, Anna, Maria Via Stoppani, 9 I-20017 Rho / IT | 03 /
FERRARI, Mario P. le Martini, 1 I-Milan / IT | 04 /
TRIZIO, Domenico Via Volto, 4 I-Cassina Rizzardi / IT | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89906767.2 | 16.06.1989 | [1991/15] | WO1989EP00683 | Priority number, date | GB19880014586 | 20.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8814586 | [1991/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8912638 | Date: | 28.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0420883 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420883 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/052, A61K31/425, C07D495/04 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
C07D491/04 (EP,US);
C07D491/052 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07D495/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/15] | Title | German: | TRIZYKLISCHE 3-OXO-PROPANNITRIL-DERIVATE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1991/15] | English: | TRICYCLIC 3-OXO-PROPANENITRILE DERIVATIVES AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [1991/15] | French: | DERIVES DE 3-OXO-PROPANE-NITRILE TRICYCLIQUES ET PROCEDE SERVANT A LEUR PREPARATION | [1991/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 15.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.1993 | BE | 03.11.1993 | CH | 03.11.1993 | LI | 03.11.1993 | NL | 03.11.1993 | [1994/48] |
Former [1994/39] | AT | 03.11.1993 | |
CH | 03.11.1993 | ||
LI | 03.11.1993 | ||
NL | 03.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 03.11.1993 | |
CH | 03.11.1993 | ||
LI | 03.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/31] | CH | 03.11.1993 | |
LI | 03.11.1993 | Cited in | International search | DE1926023 [ ] (SANDOZ AG); | US4268516 [ ] (LOMBARDINO JOSEPH G, et al); | EP0274443 [ ] (ERBA CARLO SPA [IT]); | EP0286346 [ ] (DU PONT [US]) |