EP0418298 - CONTROL VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/13] | CONTROL VALVES AND METHOD OF PLANT GROWING USING FLOW CONTROL | ||
[1995/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Strathclyde McCance Building, 16 Richmond Street Glasgow G1 1YQ Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states University of Strathclyde McCance Building, 16 Richmond Street Glasgow G1 1YQ, Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHAM, Neil, Bonnette 6 Kilmardinney Grove Bearsden Glasgow G61 3NY / GB | 02 /
ROSS, Donald, S. 3 Keir Drive Bishopbriggs G64 3BT / GB | 03 /
SZMIDT, Robert, Aleksander, Karasinski 25 Scaur O'Doon Road Doonfoot Ayr KA7 4EP / GB | 04 /
KIRKWOOD, Ralph, Christie Glaslyn Loch Park Doonfoot Ayr KA7 4EU / GB | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Gallafent, Richard John Gallafents Ltd The Old Vicarage Stanbridge, Bedfordshire LU7 9HX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Gallafent, Richard John GALLAFENT & CO. 8 Staple Inn London WCIV 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89906798.7 | 09.06.1989 | [1991/13] | WO1989GB00643 | Priority number, date | GB19880013837 | 10.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8813837 | GB19880013839 | 10.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8813839 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8911787 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0418298 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0418298 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01G25/16, F16K7/14, F16K31/00, A01G31/00 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
F16K31/001 (EP,US);
A01G25/167 (EP,US);
A01G31/02 (EP,US);
Y02P60/21 (EP,US);
Y10T137/189 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/36] |
Former [1991/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | REGELVENTILE | [1995/01] | English: | CONTROL VALVES | [1995/01] | French: | VANNES DE REGULATION | [1995/01] |
Former [1991/13] | REGELVENTILE UND PFLANZENZUCHTVERFAHREN MIT ZUFLUSSREGELUNG | ||
Former [1991/13] | CONTROL VALVES AND METHOD OF PLANT GROWING USING FLOW CONTROL | ||
Former [1991/13] | VANNES DE REGULATION ET PROCEDE DE CULTURE VEGETALE UTILISANT LA REGULATION DE L'ECOULEMENT | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/01: Teilanmeldung 93201698.3 eingereicht am 14/06/93 | EPB 1995/01: Divisional application 93201698.3 filed on 14/06/93 | EPB 1995/01: Demande divisionnaire 93201698.3 déposée le 14/06/93 | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 10.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 11.01.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU, SE | 22.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP93201698.3 / EP0570080 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.02.1991 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1991 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.1995 | CH | 04.01.1995 | LI | 04.01.1995 | [1995/40] |
Former [1995/32] | CH | 04.01.1995 | |
LI | 04.01.1995 | Cited in | International search | FR931540 [ ]; | DE1045194 [ ] (DISTILLERS CO YEAST LTD); | GB1006801 [ ] (THURE HENNING HANSSON); | US3426539 [ ] (WHEAR ALFRED L); | DE1929916 [ ] (SCHWARZBACH DR ERIK); | DE2325980 [ ] (EDENHORN KNUT BERTIL); | GB1376091 [ ] (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | DE2604080 [ ] (KUROSAWA TOYOKI); | FR2345894 [ ] (ELEKTROWATT AG [CH]); | EP0004159 [ ] (ORNSTEIN LEONARD); | GB2017868 [ ] (BECKMANN G); | WO8203529 [ ] (BENTLE PROD AG [CH], et al); | EP0072214 [ ] (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | WO8402827 [ ] (DYNAMIC INTERNATIONAL AS [DK]); | US4463522 [ ] (LINDEMANN ECKHART [US]); | EP0230150 [ ] (SPRAYING SYSTEMS CO [US]); | GB2194124 [ ] (FISONS PLC); | GB2216512 [ ] (FERNANDES PAULA JANETTA FOSTER [GB]) |