EP0418307 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ELECTRODES FOR A SPARK PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.1994 [1994/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. Law Department, P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. Law Department, P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, David, Joseph 630 West North Street Fostoria, OH 44830 / US | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Turner, Alan Reginald, et al c/o Bendix Limited Douglas Road Kingswood, Bristol BS15 2NL / GB | [1991/13] | Application number, filing date | 89906906.6 | 31.03.1989 | [1991/13] | WO1989US01368 | Priority number, date | US19880202285 | 06.06.1988 Original published format: US 202285 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8912338 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0418307 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01T21/02 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
H01T21/02 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/13] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ZÜNDKERZENELEKTRODEN | [1991/13] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ELECTRODES FOR A SPARK PLUG | [1991/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ELECTRODES POUR UNE BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE | [1991/13] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 01.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 01.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/13] | 03.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]BE904355 (CHAMPION SPARK PLUG CO) |